EP1359317 - Connecting device with nut having right-hand and left-hand threading [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/50] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stadler, Werner Calwer Strasse 43 71732 Tamm / DE | 02 /
Eisenmenger, Matthias Sudetenring 24 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
Ochedowski, Richard Landsknechtstrasse 37 70437 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/32] |
Former [2004/51] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70686 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005775.6 | 14.03.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE2002119259 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10219259 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359317 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359317 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/00, F16B7/06, F16B5/02 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
F02M55/005 (EP);
F16B37/00 (EP);
F16B2033/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung mit einer Spannmutter mit Rechts- und Linksgewinde | [2003/45] | English: | Connecting device with nut having right-hand and left-hand threading | [2003/45] | French: | Dispositif de connexion avec ecrou avec filet à droite et filet à gauche | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0194501 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5782078 (BRANTLEY JAMES W [US]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-6; | [A]US5957507 (ASADA KIKUO [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]EP1118766 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |