EP1356795 - Set for constructing a reinforcing implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/44] | Set for constructing a modular implant | ||
[2004/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESKA Implants GmbH & Co. Grapengiesserstrasse 34 23556 Lübeck / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grundei, Hans, Dr. Hamburger Strasse 89 23558 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Karpf, P.-M., Prof. Dr. Freyung 625 84028 Landshut / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03005974.5 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | DE2002118801 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10218801 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356795 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356795 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
A61F2/4637 (EP);
A61F2/30907 (EP);
A61F2/3601 (EP);
A61F2/4607 (EP);
A61F2002/30143 (EP);
A61F2002/3021 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/30495 (EP);
A61F2002/30507 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/30616 (EP);
A61F2002/30652 (EP);
A61F2002/30673 (EP);
A61F2002/30774 (EP);
A61F2002/3079 (EP);
A61F2002/30795 (EP);
A61F2002/30797 (EP);
A61F2002/3081 (EP);
A61F2002/30822 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/30909 (EP);
A61F2002/30919 (EP);
A61F2002/3092 (EP);
A61F2002/3621 (EP);
A61F2002/4619 (EP);
A61F2002/4638 (EP);
A61F2002/4641 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
A61F2230/0017 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
A61F2310/00011 (EP);
A61F2310/00179 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Set zur Erstellung eines Armierungsimplantates | [2003/44] | English: | Set for constructing a reinforcing implant | [2004/31] | French: | Ensemble pour la construction d'un implant de renforcement | [2004/31] |
Former [2003/44] | Set for constructing a modular implant | ||
Former [2003/44] | Ensemble pour la construction d'un implant modulaire | Examination procedure | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.12.2004 | CZ | 15.12.2004 | EE | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IE | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | RO | 15.12.2004 | SI | 15.12.2004 | SK | 15.12.2004 | TR | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | HU | 16.03.2005 | CY | 18.03.2005 | LU | 18.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/41] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
RO | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
CY | 18.03.2005 | ||
LU | 18.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
CY | 18.03.2005 | ||
LU | 18.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
CY | 18.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR989341 (STEENBRUGGHE HENRI VAN) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, paragraph L - page 2, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 12 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2685877 (MARTIN DOBELLE) [Y] 7 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 43; figure - *; | [Y]DE923383 (TIMMERMANS FRANS DONATUS DR ME) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 59 - line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]GB764600 (PRYOR & HOWARD LTD, et al) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 60 - line 65 * * page 2, line 1 - line 42; figures 5,6 * [A] 9; | [A]DE3306171 (SULZER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 5; figure 4 *; | [A]US5605457 (BAILEY A GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 8 - line 9; figure 5 *; | [A]DE19629322 (CERASIV GMBH [DE]) [A] 6* column 1, line 51 - line 58; figure - *; | [A]EP0853928 (MAN CERAMICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 4 - line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0878176 (ESKA IMPLANTS GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 4,5,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1059070 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 3 * | Examination | FR59919E |