EP1347472 - Armature and armature driving device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuhara, Kazuyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
Fukuhara, Kazuyuki, c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki K 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006065.1 | 19.03.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | JP20020079266 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002079266 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347472 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347472 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347472 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/20, F02M59/46, F02M59/34, F02M63/02, F16K31/06 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F02M63/0017 (EP,US);
F02D41/20 (EP,US);
F02M59/34 (EP,US);
F02M63/0021 (EP,US);
F02M63/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | H01F7/06, H01F7/16, F02M59/46, F02M63/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/51] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anker und Ankersantriebsvorrichtung | [2003/39] | English: | Armature and armature driving device | [2003/39] | French: | Induit et entrainement de l'induit | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07224960 ; | [A]JP2001248521 ; | [A]JP2000146007 ; | [A]JPH03156164 ; | [E]WO03048558 (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-8,11 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07224960 A 19950822 (NOK CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001248521 A 20010914 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000146007 A 20000526 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910930), vol. 015, no. 386, Database accession no. (M - 1163), & JP03156164 A 19910704 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10246169 |