EP1323820 - Process for facillitated recovery of heterologous proteins from bacterial cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leung, Woon-Lam Susan 609 Cuesta Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 02 /
Swartz, James R. 1860 White Oak Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Wichmann, Hendrik Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr. Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006278.0 | 21.10.1999 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | US19980106052P | 28.10.1998 Original published format: US 106052 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323820 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323820 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323820 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/06, C07K16/28, C07K14/65, C12N15/70 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
C12N9/2462 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/65 (EP,US);
C07K16/2845 (EP,US);
C12N1/06 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/54 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | C12N1/06, C07K16/28, C12N15/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von heterologen Polypeptiden aus Bakterienzellen | [2003/27] | English: | Process for facillitated recovery of heterologous proteins from bacterial cells | [2003/27] | French: | Procédé de récupération de polypeptides hétérologues à partir de cellules bactériennes | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99971031.2 / EP1124941 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0155189 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4637980 (AUERBACH JEFFREY I [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO8702702 (KABIGEN AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 1 * * page 2, lines 9-34 * * page 12, line 35 - page 15, line 26 *; | [A]WO9324633 (INNOVATIVE TECH CENTER [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9412214 (PROTEIN DESIGN LABS INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - LEUNG ET AL, "Genetic manipulations to improve large-scale product recovery; periplasmic refractile particle purification using phage T4 lysozyme", ABSTR.PAP.AM.CHEM.SOC. 216TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING. 23-27 AUGUST, 1998, Boston, MA, USA, page 216, XP000889901 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - LIN J J, "Endonuclease A degrades chromosomal and plasmid DNA of Escherichia coli present in most preparations of single stranded DNA from phagemids.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL SCIENCE COUNCIL, REPUBLIC OF CHINA. PART B, LIFE SCIENCES, (1992 JAN) 16 (1) 1-5., XP000864468 [A] * figures 1,3 * * page 2 * * page 4, column R * | [A] - JEKEL M ET AL, "The periplasmic endonuclease I of Escherichia coli has amino-acid sequence homology to the extracellular DNases of Vibrio cholerae and Aeromonas hydrophila", GENE,NL,ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, (19950227), vol. 154, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 55 - 59, XP004042502 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)00835-G | [A] - SOUTHER A ET AL, "DEGRADATION OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI CHROMOSOME AFTER INFECTION BY BACTERIO PHAGE T-4 ROLE OF BACTERIO PHAGE GENE D-2-A.", J VIROL, (1972) 10 (5), 979 -984., XP000864467 [A] * figures 1,2 * | [A] - WAN, EUGENE W.-M. ET AL, "TolAIII co-overexpression facilitates the recovery of periplasmic recombinant proteins into the growth medium of Escherichia coli.", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (OCT., 1998) VOL. 14, NO. 1, PP. 13-22., XP000864465 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1998.0941 |