EP1459957 - Perambulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUCK GmbH & Co. KG Frohnlacher Strasse 8 96242 Sonnefeld / DE | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feyler, Jörg Wiesenstrasse 14 D-96242 Sonnefeld / DE | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Schultz-Süchting, Rolf Rechtsanwälte Ballindamm 9 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2005/36] |
Former [2004/39] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006485.1 | 21.03.2003 | [2004/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459957 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459957 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/08, B62B9/00 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
B62B7/123 (EP);
B62B9/00 (EP);
B62B9/104 (EP);
B62B9/22 (EP);
B62B2205/003 (EP);
B62B5/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | Kinderwagen | [2004/39] | English: | Perambulator | [2004/39] | French: | Voiture d'enfant | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 14.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2005 | CZ | 30.11.2005 | EE | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | BG | 28.02.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | HU | 01.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09240480 ; | [AD]US5257799 (CONE RICHARD E [US], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4328567 (WEGNER ALBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29716952U (HOFMANN CHRISTA [DE]) [A] 1* page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 9; figure -; claims 1,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09240480 A 19970916 (COMBI CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |