EP1361325 - Actuator for closures of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states HUF HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GMBH & CO. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spies, Wolfgang Uwe Rathmacher Weg 38 42781 Haan / DE | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 03006967.8 | 27.03.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | DE2002118915 | 27.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10218915 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361325 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361325 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, H01H13/14, E05B65/12 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
E05B81/76 (EP);
H01H3/166 (EP);
E05B83/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Betätiger für Verschlüsse an Fahrzeugen | [2003/46] | English: | Actuator for closures of vehicles | [2003/46] | French: | Actionneur pour fermetures des vehicules | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4311894 (GREENWALD HARRY) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3440442 (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3513555 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 20, line 15 - page 23, line 6; figures 8-12 *; | [A]EP0884440 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0070633 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-9 * |