EP1462234 - Auto screen-printing method for use in injection-molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | Auto screen-printing method for use in IMR and injection-molding | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYI Precision Tech Corp. 59, Wu-Chung 7 Road, Wu Ku Industry Park Taipei County / TW | [2006/46] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Taiyi Precision Tech Corp. 59, Wu-Chun 7 Road, Wu Ku Industry Park Taipei County / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Jui Peng TAIYI Precision Tech Corporat., 59 Wu-Chung 7 Road Wu Ku Industry Park, Taipei County / TW | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007032.0 | 27.03.2003 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462234 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462234 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B32B37/00, // B41M1/12 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B32B38/14 (EP);
B29C45/14811 (EP);
B29C45/14827 (EP);
B29C2045/14704 (EP);
B29K2995/002 (EP);
B29K2995/0087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | B29C45/14, B32B31/00, // B41M1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Siebdruckverfahren zur Verwendung beim Spritzgiessen | [2006/25] | English: | Auto screen-printing method for use in injection-molding | [2006/25] | French: | Procédé de sérigraphie et son utilisation dans le moulage par injection | [2006/25] |
Former [2004/40] | Siebdruckverfahren zur verwendung beim IMR und spritzgiessverfahren | ||
Former [2004/40] | Auto screen-printing method for use in IMR and injection-molding | ||
Former [2004/40] | Procédé de sérigraphie et son utilisation dans l'IMR et le moulage par injection | Examination procedure | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 30.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4369157 (CONNER FRANCIS J) [A] 1 * page 12, line 26 - page 15, line 19 *; | [A]WO0051829 (REXAM IND CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 6, line 16 - column 10, line 34 *; | [X]EP1125764 (NISSHA PRINTING [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0089] *; | [A]US2002100387 (CHURCHWELL RICHARD N [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * |