EP1362627 - Multilayer filter structure and use of multilayer structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRANOFILTER GMBH Industriestrasse 23 D-90599 Dietenhofen / DE | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmierer, Uwe Mühlweg 4 91622 Unternbibert-Rügland / DE | 02 /
Rammig, Jürgen Ziegelhüttenstrasse 3a 91564 Neuendettelsau / DE | 03 /
Hornfeck, Ulrich, Dr. Selbitzer Berg 14 95119 Naila / DE | 04 /
Straub, Roland Schneegasse 1 97618 Eichenhausen / DE | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Vogler, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Vogler, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Bregenzer, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | Reimold, Otto, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007096.5 | 28.03.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | DE2002121694 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10221694 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362627 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, B01D46/52, B01D46/12 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
A47L9/12 (EP,US);
A47L9/14 (EP,US);
B01D46/0028 (EP,US);
B01D46/02 (EP,US);
B01D46/12 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0414 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0442 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0636 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0659 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0668 (EP,US);
B01D2275/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | Mehrlagiger Filteraufbau und Verwendung eines mehrlagigen Filteraufbaus | [2003/47] | English: | Multilayer filter structure and use of multilayer structure | [2003/47] | French: | Structure de filtre multicouche et utilisation d'une structure de filtre multicouche | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5778917 ; | [A]US4164400 (WALD STEPHEN A [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4702940 (NAKAYAMA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]US4714647 (SHIPP JR PETER W [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [A]EP0904819 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [AD]EP0960645 (AIRFLO EUROPE NV [BE]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820819), vol. 6, no. 158, & JP57078917 A 19820517 (KANAI HIROYUKI) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |