EP1357286 - Engine control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Atsuo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Karatsu, Hiroshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nagatsuyu, Toshiya c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2003/44] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007143.5 | 28.03.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | JP20020120497 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002120497 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357286 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357286 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357286 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02D41/04 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
F02N19/005 (EP);
B62M6/25 (EP);
F02N11/0833 (EP);
B60W2300/36 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60Y2200/12 (EP);
F02D2041/0095 (EP);
F02D2200/0404 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
F02N2019/007 (EP);
F02N2200/0801 (EP);
F02N2300/2011 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2016/49] |
Former [2007/19] | ES, FR, IT | ||
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorsteuereinheit | [2003/44] | English: | Engine control unit | [2003/44] | French: | Unité de commande d'un moteur | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001132489 ; | [A]EP1046813 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6* figures 17,19,20 *; | [PX]EP1227230 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1 * paragraph [0002]; figures 2,3 *; | [PA]WO02063163 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PA] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1288472 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0030] , [0049] , [0059] - [0061] - [0068] , [0074] - [0077]; figure 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001132489 A 20010515 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10131779 |