EP1384924 - Disc check valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWE Hydraulik SE Streitfeldstrasse 25 81673 München / DE | [2009/05] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states HAWE Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Streitfeldstrasse 25 81673 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumair, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Dorfstrasse 3 85402 Thalhausen / DE | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007174.0 | 28.03.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | DE2002211042U | 22.07.2002 Original published format: DE 20211042 U | [2004/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384924 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1384924 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/02 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
F16K15/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [2004/43] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plättchen-Rückschlagventil | [2004/05] | English: | Disc check valve | [2004/05] | French: | Soupape aniretour à disque | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 29.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB707803 (CRANE CO) [YD] 1-3,7-9 * page 1, line 51 - page 2, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE1959994 (BARKAS WERKE VEB) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2449443 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN) [A] 1 * page 13, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2726645 (JANSSEN WEETS PETER) [A] 1* page 7, paragraph L; figure 10 *; | [YD]DE19927392 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-3,7-9 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 50; figure 1 * | by applicant | GB707803 | DE19927392 |