EP1359650 - Connection device for an electric distribution installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hager Electro GmbH & Co. KG Zum Gunterstal 66440 Blieskastel / DE | [2013/34] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Hager Electro GmbH Im Hofgarten 66131 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dissel, Klaus Schneckenstrasse 10 a 66131 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Manfred Brückstrasse 7 66131 Saarbrücken / DE | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Matthias, et al Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft mbB Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Wolff, Matthias, et al Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2013/36] | Bernhardt, Winfrid, et al Patentanwälte Bernhardt Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Bernhardt, Winfrid, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Bernhardt Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007188.0 | 29.03.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE2002119794 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10219794 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359650 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359650 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/32 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H02B1/04 (EP);
H02B1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, SE [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung für elektrische Verteiler | [2003/45] | English: | Connection device for an electric distribution installation | [2003/45] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement pour installation de distribution électrique | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 06.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2004 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/09] | SE | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1993996U (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 2* page 2, paragraph 4; figure - *; | [X]FR2368812 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [X] 1,4-6 * page 1; figure - *; | [X]EP0496458 (VYNCKIER NV [BE]) [X] 1,4-6 * figure - * | Examination | DE19610854 | WO9936987 |