EP1350826 - Active energy ray-curing adhesive composition and keypad for push-button switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYMATECH CO., LTD. 8-16, Nihononbashi-Honcho 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-0023 / JP | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2008/46] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Polymatech Co., Ltd. 8-16, Nihononbashi-Honcho 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ootsuka, Nobuyuki, Shibukawa Plant, Denki Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 1135, Nakamura Shibukawa-shi, Gunma, 377-0002 / JP | 02 /
Iriuchijima, Kunio, Shibukawa Plant, Denki Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 1135, Nakamura Shibukawa-shi, Gunma, 377-0002 / JP | 03 /
Sakurai, Tetsuya, Shibukawa Plant, Denki Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 1135, Nakamura Shibukawa-shi, Gunma, 377-0002 / JP | 04 /
Nishi, Kengo, R&D Center of Polymatech Co., Ltd. 10-5, Tabata 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0014 / JP | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007193.0 | 29.03.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | JP20020099653 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002099653 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350826 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350826 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/12, C09J133/26, C09J175/14, C08J5/12, H01H13/70 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
C09J175/16 (EP,US);
C08J5/124 (EP,US);
C09J133/04 (EP,US);
C09J133/14 (EP,US);
C09J133/26 (EP,US);
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C09J2301/416 (EP,US);
H01H2209/016 (EP,US);
H01H2209/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F220/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [2004/27] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Strählenhartbare Klebstoffzusammensetzung and Tasten für Drucktastenschalter | [2003/41] | English: | Active energy ray-curing adhesive composition and keypad for push-button switch | [2003/41] | French: | Composition adhésive durcissable par rayonnement et touches pour interrupteur à bouton poussoir | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 08.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) TR | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6017603 (TOKUDA KIYOHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 5-10 * * column 3, lines 24-30 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, lines 3-32 *; | [X]WO0011097 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 3, lines 5-28 * * page 11, lines 20-31 * * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 6 * * page 21, lines 16-22 * * page 22, lines 18-26 * * page 26, lines 4-14 *; | [A]EP1031596 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [PA]WO0249011 (LOCTITE CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP1244125 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0028]; claim 1 * |