EP1352800 - Fluid reservoir for a master cylinder in a hydraulic force transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FTE automotive GmbH & Co. KG Andreas-Humann-Strasse 2 96106 Ebern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states FTE automotive GmbH & Co. KG Andreas-Humann-Strasse 2 96106 Ebern / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states FTE automotive GmbH Andreas-Humann-Strasse 2 96106 Ebern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bornkessel, Diethard Schweikershäuser Strasse 1 96126 Ermershausen / DE | 02 /
Leuschke, Rainer 233 Brookwood Drive 48178 South Lyon, Michigan / US | 03 /
Scott, Elliott 31130 Woodstone 136 48377 Novi, Michigan / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Mark Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Oppermann, Mark, Dipl.-Ing. Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007642.6 | 03.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | DE2002116362 | 13.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216362 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352800 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352800 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/22 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
B60T11/16 (EP,US);
B60T11/26 (EP,US);
B60T17/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | Nachlaufbehälter für einen Geberzylinder eines hydraulischen Kraftübertragungssystems | [2003/42] | English: | Fluid reservoir for a master cylinder in a hydraulic force transmission system | [2003/42] | French: | Réservoir de fluide pour un maître cylindre d'un système de transmission de force | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.09.2004 | CZ | 15.09.2004 | EE | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | RO | 15.09.2004 | SI | 15.09.2004 | SK | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | HU | 16.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | AT | 03.04.2005 | CY | 03.04.2005 | LU | 03.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/41] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
EE | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
RO | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
EE | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
EE | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
EE | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
EE | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
HU | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
SI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 15.09.2004 | |
CZ | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CZ | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | CZ | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
SK | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3403517 (LEWIS RICHARD L) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]AU498927B (REPCO LTD) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5025628 (LAYMAN JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 6-12* figures 5-8 * | by applicant | DE2440000 | DE10038982 |