EP1465324 - Electric motor with reverse preventing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruschke, Rolf-Eberhard Herzberger Strasse 10 01239 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Jakubec, Ralph Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 6e 01705 Freital / DE | 03 /
Maschke, Norbert Lortzingstrasse 12 01307 Dresden / DE | 04 /
Rieger, Thomas Franzensbader Weg 7 93057 Regensburg / DE | [2004/41] | Application number, filing date | 03007701.0 | 03.04.2003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1465324 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465324 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/118 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
H02K7/1185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/26] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromotor mit Rücklaufsperre | [2004/41] | English: | Electric motor with reverse preventing mechanism | [2004/41] | French: | Moteur électrique avec dispositif anti-retour | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3416014 (KUZARA JOHN C) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1545100 (MALLORY & CO INC P R) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR1460560 (CROUZET SA) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]FR1128339 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR1075390 (REYMOND ROGER-ORIGENE) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |