EP1357344 - Heat exchanger with floating head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calanog, Marciano M. 14501 Akker Court Gainesville, Virginia 20155 / US | 02 /
Rudy, Thomas M. 8336 Stable Gate Road Warrenton, Virginia 20186 / US | 03 /
Wanni, Amar S. 8131 Shadwell Park Lane Falls Church, Virginia 20155 / US | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 03007752.3 | 04.04.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | US20020374663P | 23.04.2002 Original published format: US 374663 P | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357344 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357344 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357344 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/16, F28F9/02 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
F28F9/0137 (EP,US);
F28D7/16 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (EP,US);
F28F9/0229 (EP,US);
F28F9/0241 (EP,US);
F28F9/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/01] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher mit schwimmendem Endkasten | [2003/44] | English: | Heat exchanger with floating head | [2003/44] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur avec collecteur flottant | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2512748 (LUCKE CHARLES E) [A] 1* figure - *; | [Y]DE1109724 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3656543 (WOLOWODIUK WALTER, et al) [Y] 8-10,13,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2247490 (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [Y]US3822741 (LIPPITSCH J) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB2164738 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR) [X] 1-4,17 * page 3, line 5 - line 66; figure - * [Y] 5-14; | [Y]DE3625408 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4961464 (WOLLBECK RUDI [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US19820102090 |