EP1352768 - Open roof for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2005/17] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Gaillard, Francois 2 rue de la Motte 85390 Mouilleron en Pareds / FR | 02 /
De Waal, Martin Zomerzon 17 1566 TS Assendelft / NL | 03 /
Guicheteau, Jean-Luc 57 rue des Orfevres 49300 Cholet / FR | 04 /
Kimoto, Izumi 1-4-25 Miyajimaguchi-ue, Oono-cho Saeki-gun 739-0413 Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Kölbl, Michael Jagerbauerstrasse 9 82061 Neuried / DE | 06 /
Mitterbauer, Peter Brunnenweg 25 4810 Gmunden / AT | 07 /
Pollak, Martin Loheweg 4a 82178 Puchheim / DE | 08 /
Righetti, Claudio Ivano Corso Racconigi 26 10139 Torino / IT | 09 /
Schönauer, Miriam Lindenstrasse 12 85405 Nandlstadt / DE | 10 /
Ueki, Sigeru 7-17-3 Takaya-Takamigaoka 739-2115 Higashihiroshima-City / JP | 11 /
Vecchioni, Bernhard 523 Bay Pointe Drive Oxford, Michigan 48371 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/42] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007826.5 | 04.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | DE20021015969 | 11.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10215969 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352768 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1352768 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352768 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/04, B60J7/16, B60J7/08 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
B60J7/145 (EP,US);
B60J7/028 (EP,US);
B60J7/201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | B60J7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/51] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Öffnungsfähiges Dach für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/42] | English: | Open roof for motor vehicle | [2003/42] | French: | Toit ouvrant pour vehicule automobile | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 25.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.11.2008 | GB | 04.04.2009 | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/25] | NL | 12.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0235616 (KAMEI GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figures 3-10 *; | [X]GB2194759 (WOODS PAUL HAROLD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4750778 (HOBAN EDWARD [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-12 *; | [DA]US4805956 (SAUNDERS CHARLES L [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US5056857 (NEY CLYDE W [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-11 *; | [DA]US5098148 (HOBAN EDWARD [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2745766 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR]) [A] 1* figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2767755 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5906408 (COOPER HERBERT [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * figures 10-12 * | by applicant | US4750778 | US4805956 | US5056857 | US5098148 | US5906408 |