EP1467269 - Identification of local devices in a data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ads-tec GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 14 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states ads-tec AUTOMATION DATEN- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 14 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Automation Daten- und Systemtechnik GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 14 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speidel, Thomas Lemberger Weg 13 71706 Markgröningen / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Wasmuth, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007884.4 | 07.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467269 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/41855 (EP);
G05B2219/24206 (EP);
G05B2219/25296 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | Identifikation lokaler Vorrichtungen in einem Datenverarbeitungssystem | [2004/42] | English: | Identification of local devices in a data processing system | [2004/42] | French: | Identification des dispositifs locaux dans une installation de traitement de données | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/23] | 18.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2674966 (IND ENTREPRISE [FR]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 33 * * page 6, line 29 - page 9, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6000825 (FREDRIKSSON LARS-BERNO [SE]) [A] 1-9* column 5, line 9 - line 49 * |