EP1353089 - Suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon Ohio 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon, Ohio 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Gijsel, Geert Isaac da Costadreef 24 5051 MB Goirle / NL | 02 /
Naaijkens, Peter Goirkestraat 8 5046 GK Tilburg / NL | 03 /
Laughlin, Raymond S. 11207 Wadsworth Avenue Garfield Heights, Ohio 44125 / NL | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03007981.8 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020371978P | 12.04.2002 Original published format: US 371978 P | US20030392541 | 20.03.2003 Original published format: US 392541 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353089 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1353089 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/10 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
F16L3/137 (EP,US);
F16G11/02 (EP,US);
F16G11/106 (EP,US);
Y10T24/31 (EP,US);
Y10T24/394 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3951 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3996 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | Aufhängungsvorrichtung | [2003/42] | English: | Suspension system | [2003/42] | French: | Système de suspension | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/05] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/05] | Request for further processing for: | 23.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US1391457 (BUCKLEY JOHN A, et al) [Y] 11,20 * page 1, line 69 - line 78; figures 3,4 * [A] 29,37,42,43; | [AX]US2190661 (ARTHUR HAUER) [A] 6,7,13,14,23,26,31,32,36 * page 1, column R, line 4 - line 33; figure 3 * [X] 21; | [Y]GB658036 (HARRY TRUSWELL) [Y] 1,3,10 * page 2, line 39 - line 43; figure 2 *; | [AD]US2819923 (DOYLE ANDERSON); | [AY]US4519564 (NADHERNY RUDOLPH E [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 8, line 13 - line 34; figures 4,11 * [Y] 29; | [AX]WO8901455 (DAVIES PHILLIP EDWARD [AU]) [A] 9,12,16,26,27,30,34,36 * page 3, line 1 - line 21; figures 1,2 * [X] 21,22; | [AX]GB2247926 (GRIPPLE LTD [GB]) [A] 7,12,14,23,26,30,32,36 * page 2, line 7 - line 28; figure 4 * [X] 21,22; | [AX]WO9304303 (WINSTANLEY JAMES [GB]) [A] 7,12,30 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 4; figure 1 * [X] 21,22; | [A]US5423108 (BRENNAN DANIEL F [US]) [A] 25,33 * column 4, line 29 - line 43; figure 5 *; | [X]CH687221 (JAKOB AG [CH]) [X] 45,46 * column 5, line 11 - line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [YD]US6003210 (FACEY HUGH DAVID [GB], et al) [YD] 1,3,10,11,20,29 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2268463 (FRAPPIER BENOIT [CA]) [A] 2-5,19 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 13; figures 1-7 *; | [E]FR2832778 (MORALES TERCERO S C [ES], et al) [E] 21,22 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2819923 | US6003210 |