EP1353092 - Linear motion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK LTD. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/25] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okita, Shigeru c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Uyama, Hideyuki c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Susumu c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Iso, Kenichi c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2009/02] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
Okita, Shigeru NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Uyama, Hideyuki NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Susumu NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Iso, Kenichi NSK Ltd., 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008015.4 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | JP20020109409 | 11.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002109409 | JP20020117853 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002117853 | JP20020138957 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002138957 | JP20020155977 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002155977 | JP20020175835 | 17.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002175835 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353092 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1353092 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353092 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/22, F16C33/30, F16C33/37, F16C29/06 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
F16C33/3706 (EP,US);
F16C29/06 (EP,US);
F16C33/32 (EP,US);
F16H25/2238 (EP,US);
F16C2204/70 (EP);
F16H2025/2242 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | F16H25/22, F16C33/30 | ||
Former IPC [2003/42] | F16H25/22 | Designated contracting states | DE [2006/24] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Linearführungsvorrichtung | [2003/42] | English: | Linear motion device | [2003/42] | French: | Système à guide linéaire | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 06.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6071358 (OKITA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 31, line 52 - line 67 * * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US2001039234 (NIWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,3,7,9 *; | [A]EP1167791 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 2* paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * | by applicant | JPH10103445 | JPH11300803 | JPH11315835 | JP2000039052 | JP2000199556 | JP2000291770 | JP2001021018 | JP2001124172 |