EP1329733 - Integrated protection system with arcing fault detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/30] | Arcing fault detection system | ||
[2005/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooks, Stanley J. 101 Jemima Drive Richmond, KY 40475 / US | 02 /
Dickens, James W. 619 Halifax Drive Lexington, KY 40503 / US | 03 /
Fleege, Dennis W. 1002 Quarry Avenue, S.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | 04 /
Larson, Brett E. 2921 Mansfield Avenue, S.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52403 / US | 05 /
Fixemer, James V. Route 1 Denton, NE 68339 / US | 06 /
Turner, Dauane L. 4960 Kesler Road, N.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52405 / US | 07 /
Wiese, Gregory S. 2607 29th Ave. Marion, IA 52302 / US | 08 /
Dvorak, Robert F. 206 Candlestick Drive Mr. Vernon, Iowa 52314 / US | 09 /
Haun, Andy A. 3605 Old Orchard Road, N.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | 10 /
Erger, Robert J. 2704 Holly Ct. N.W. Swisher, IA 52338 / US | 11 /
Wong, Kon B. 2318 29th Street, S.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | 12 /
Bettis, Charles D. 1100 33rd Street, N.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52402 / US | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/30] | 01 /
Brooks, Stanley J. 5191 Windrow Road Rockvale, TN 37153 / US | ||
02 /
Dickens, James W. 619 Halifax Drive Lexington, KY 40503 / US | |||
03 /
Fleege, Dennis W. 1002 Quarry Avenue, S.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | |||
04 /
Larson, Brett E. 2921 Mansfield Avenue, S.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52403 / US | |||
05 /
Fixemer, James V. Route 1 Denton, NE 68339 / US | |||
06 /
Turner, Dauane L. 4960 Kesler Road, N.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52405 / US | |||
07 /
Wiese, Gregory S. 2000 N. Ridge Drive Coralville, Iowa 52441 / US | |||
08 /
Dvorak, Robert F. 206 Candlestick Drive Mr. Vernon, Iowa 52314 / US | |||
09 /
Haun, Andy A. 3605 Old Orchard Road, N.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | |||
10 /
Erger, Robert J. 2407 A Avenue, N.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | |||
11 /
Wong, Kon B. 2318 29th Street, S.W. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52404 / US | |||
12 /
Bettis, Charles D. 1100 33rd Street, N.E. Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52402 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008096.4 | 23.01.1998 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | US19970788969 | 24.01.1997 Original published format: US 788969 | US19970789659 | 27.01.1997 Original published format: US 789659 | US19970794848 | 04.02.1997 Original published format: US 794848 | US19970796745 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: US 796745 | US19970799095 | 11.02.1997 Original published format: US 799095 | US19970804420 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 804420 | US19970827031 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: US 827031 | US19970825005 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: US 825005 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329733 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329733 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329733 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/00, H02B1/04 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/1272 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
H02H1/0015 (EP);
H01H2083/201 (EP);
H01H2089/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/30] | Title | German: | Integriertes Schutzsystem mit Lichtbogenfehlererfassung | [2005/46] | English: | Integrated protection system with arcing fault detectors | [2005/46] | French: | Système de protection intégré avec détecteurs de défauts d'arc | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/30] | Lichtbogenfehlerdetektor | ||
Former [2003/30] | Arcing fault detection system | ||
Former [2003/30] | Détecteur de défauts d'arc | Examination procedure | 15.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98903658.7 / EP1012611 | Divisional application(s) | EP06002973.3 / EP1657559 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | IE | 23.01.2007 | LU | 23.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7255110 ; | [A]US3911323 (WILSON JOHN T, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]US4949214 (SPENCER GEORGE A [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 14 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5233511 (BILAS RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 21 - line 37; figures 1a,1b *; | [A]EP0649207 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 10 - line 22; figures 1,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP7255110 A 19951003 (YOKOO DENKI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |