EP1333420 - Planar display panel controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Atsushi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Arimoto, Hironobu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Hiroshi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008115.2 | 30.03.1998 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | JP19970080540 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8054097 | JP19970080541 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8054197 | JP19970308829 | 11.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30882997 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333420 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333420 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28, G09G3/00, G09G3/10 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
G09G3/2803 (EP,US);
G09G3/282 (EP,US);
G09G3/2983 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/22 (EP,US);
H01J11/34 (EP,US);
H01J9/241 (EP,US);
G09G2300/026 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | G09G3/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/32] | Title | German: | Steuerungsgerät für eine Flachanzeigetafel | [2003/32] | English: | Planar display panel controller | [2003/32] | French: | Contrôleur pour un panneau d'affichage planaire | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 30.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98911103.4 / EP0908919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01131598 ; | [A]JPH0832904 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 07, & JP01131598 A 19890524 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08032904 A 19960202 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |