EP1467206 - Biosensor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68298 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasielke, Joachim Anton-Bruckner-Strasse 4 68782 Bruehl / DE | 02 /
Marquant, Michael Ida-Dehmel-Ring 84 68309 Mannheim / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008143.4 | 08.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467206 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N27/416, G01N33/543 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G01N27/3273 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biosensor Vorrichtung | [2004/42] | English: | Biosensor system | [2004/42] | French: | Dispositif biocapteur | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9932881 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* page 9, lines 8-18 *; | [A]WO9946585 (USF FILTRATION & SEPARATIONS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 21 *; | [A]WO0188534 (CYGNUS THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 22, line 15 - page 26, line 30; figures 1,2; example 4 *; | [A]US6413411 (POTTGEN PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-10 *; | [A] - SKLADAL P, "Compensation of temperature variations disturbing performance of an amperometric biosensor for continuous monitoring", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19950701), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 59 - 62, XP004004390 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(94)01540-X |