EP1352603 - Vacuum cleaner with a nozzel comprising an internally driven agitator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/42] | Internally driven agitator | ||
[2009/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Royal Appliance Mfg. Co. 7005 Cochran Road Glenwillow, OH 44139 / US | [2009/36] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Royal Appliance MFG. CO. 7005 Cochran Road Glenwillow, OH 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Syverson, Charles D. 2007 Roe Crest Drive North Mankato, Minnesota 5601 / US | 02 /
Cunningham, James Vernon 62 Haskell Circle Aurora, Ontario L4G 5T6 / CA | 03 /
Gomes, Michael I. Apt. 4, Rosslinn Road Cambridge, Ontario, N1S 3K1 / CA | 04 /
Reindle, Mark E. 5806 Forest Avenue Parma, Ohio 44129 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008173.1 | 08.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020117907 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 117907 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352603 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352603 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP,US);
A47L9/0455 (EP,US);
A47L9/0477 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
H02K2207/03 (EP,US);
H02K29/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/28] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Staubsauger mit einer Düse, welche einen intern angetriebenen Agitator umfasst | [2009/18] | English: | Vacuum cleaner with a nozzel comprising an internally driven agitator | [2009/18] | French: | Aspirateur avec buse comprenant un agitateur avec moyen d'entraînement intégré | [2009/18] |
Former [2003/42] | Intern angetriebener Agitator | ||
Former [2003/42] | Internally driven agitator | ||
Former [2003/42] | Agitateur avec moyen d'entraînement intégré | Examination procedure | 11.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.12.2009 | IT | 08.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/14] | ES | 13.12.2009 | |
IT | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 13.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07327884 ; | [XY]JPH1142184 ; | [X]JPH01166730 ; | [Y]US5940927 (HAEGERMARCK ANDERS [SE], et al) [Y] 3,12,14,15,21-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 11 ** figures 1,3,4 *; | [XY]EP0947155 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,11,13 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] * * figures 5,13 * [Y] 3,12,14,15 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07327884 A 19951219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11,13,16 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 22-24 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11042184 A 19990216 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11,13,16,18-20 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 21 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 06, & JP01166730 A 19890630 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,6,7,10,13 * abstract * * figure - * |