EP1354988 - Carding machine with air jet doffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler Nonwovens GmbH Halterner Strasse 70 48249 Dülmen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states ERKO Trützschler GmbH Halterner Strasse 70 48249 Dülmen / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Erko Textilmaschinen GmbH Halterner Strasse 70 48249 Dülmen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kock, Erwin Linnertstrasse 15 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Habbel, Ludwig (Lutz), Dipl.-Ing. Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008242.4 | 09.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | DE2002205954U | 17.04.2002 Original published format: DE 20205954 U | [2003/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354988 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354988 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/46 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
D01G15/465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | Vlieskrempel mit Luftstrom-Abnehmer | [2003/43] | English: | Carding machine with air jet doffer | [2003/43] | French: | Machine à carder avec détacheur à jet d'air | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.05.2007 | CZ | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | EE | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | GB | 23.05.2007 | IE | 23.05.2007 | NL | 23.05.2007 | RO | 23.05.2007 | SI | 23.05.2007 | SK | 23.05.2007 | TR | 23.05.2007 | BG | 23.08.2007 | SE | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | HU | 24.11.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 23.05.2007 | |
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
GB | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
HU | 24.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 23.05.2007 | |
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
GB | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 23.05.2007 | |
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
GB | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 23.05.2007 | |
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
GB | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 23.05.2007 | |
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
GB | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 23.05.2007 | |
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 23.05.2007 | |
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IE | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 23.05.2007 | |
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 23.05.2007 | |
SE | 23.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1311628 (CURLATOR CORP) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, lines 56-63; figure 1 *; | [XA]US4064600 (GOTCHEL JOEL PETER, et al) [X] 1 * column 10, lines 15-32; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3; | [Y]US4130915 (GOTCHEL JOEL P, et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, lines 58-65; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1057905 (MARZOLI SPA [IT]) [A] * column 4, paragraph 16; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6202259 (BURR RANDY KEITH [US], et al) [A] * figures 2,2,3A * |