Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | BE | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | BG | Lapse: 14.03.2006 | CH | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | CY | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | CZ | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 14.03.2006 | EE | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | ES | Lapse: 25.03.2006 | FI | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | FR | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | GB | | GR | Lapse: 14.03.2006 | HU | Lapse: 15.06.2006 | IE | Lapse: 17.04.2006 | IT | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | LI | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | LU | Lapse: 16.04.2006 | MC | Lapse: 30.04.2006 | NL | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | PT | Lapse: 15.05.2006 | RO | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | SE | Lapse: 14.03.2006 | SI | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | SK | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | TR | Lapse: 14.12.2005 | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 14.12.2005 | Opposition procedure | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2006 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 22.10.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 22.10.2003 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 12/64 A | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04J 3/06 B | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 7/08 B | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 12/403 B | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 60R 16/02 B | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 21.04.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 25.08.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040624 | | Event date: | 22.09.2004 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20040809 | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Event date: | 12.01.2005 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Event date: | 04.05.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FOREST, THOMAS M. | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HEDENETZ, BERND | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | RAUSCH, MATHIAS | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TEMPLE, CHRISTOPHER | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EISELE, HARALD | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ELEND, BERND | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | UNGERMANN, JOERN | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KUEHLEWEIN, MATTHIAS | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BELSCHNER, RALF | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | LOHRMANN, PETER | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BOGENBERGER, FLORIAN | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WUERZ, THOMAS | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MILLSAP, ARNOLD | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HEUTS, PATRICK | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUGEL, ROBERT | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FUEHRER, THOMAS | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MUELLER, BERND | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HARTWICH, FLORIAN | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ZINKE, MANFRED | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BERWANGER, JOSEF | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EBNER, CHRISTIAN | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WEILER, HARALD | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FUHRMANN, PETER | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SCHEDL, ANTON | | Event date: | 03.08.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | PELLER, MARTIN | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.12.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 19.01.2006 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60302697 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20060119 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 11.01.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 01.06.2006 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Event date: | 28.06.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 30.06.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Event date: | 19.07.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Event date: | 22.11.2006 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20060915 | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 02.02.2007 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Event date: | 25.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060325 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Event date: | 15.06.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060615 | | Event date: | 17.04.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060417 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 30.04.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060430 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 15.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060515 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.03.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070202 | | Event date: | 30.06.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060416 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 29.08.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060430 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 29.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101202 AND 20101208 | | Event date: | 12.08.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR EERR | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | CORRECTION DE BOPI 07/05 - 3.2. | | Event date: | 30.12.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20111125 | | Event date: | 30.11.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 07.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP USA, INC. (N.D.GES.D.STAATES DELAWARE), AU, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Event date: | 02.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP USA, INC. (N.D.GES.D.STAATES DELAWARE), AU, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Event date: | 02.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Event date: | 02.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Event date: | 02.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200319 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 14.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Event date: | 28.10.2005 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 21.10.2005 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.06.2005 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 05.03.2004 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 05.09.2003 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 20.10.2006 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 03.11.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 29.12.2021 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20210416 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20211103 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210416 | | Event date: | 20.10.2006 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |