EP1355459 - Method for synchronizing clocks in a distributed communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin Texas 78735 / US | |||
For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | |||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin Texas 78735 / US | |||
For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | |||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, Texas 78735 / US | |||
For all designated states General Motors Corporation 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | |||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SI
SK
TR
RO
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin, Texas 78735 / US | |||
For all designated states General Motors Corporation 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | |||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SI
SK
TR
RO
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler Chrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | |||
For all designated states General Motors Corporation 30200 Mound Road Warren, MI 48090-9010 / US | |||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SI
SK
TR
RO
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forest, Thomas M. 54503 Berryfield Macomb, MI 48042-2243 / US | 02 /
Hedenetz, Bernd Bismarckstrasse 40 73770 Denkendorf / DE | 03 /
Rausch, Mathias Wallbergstrasse 30 85570 Marktschwaben / DE | 04 /
Temple, Christopher Eigerstrasse 29 81825 München / DE | 05 /
Eisele, Harald Ulmenallee 12 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 06 /
Elend, Bernd Alsterdorfer Strasse 81 22299 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
Ungermann, Jörn Am Weissenberg 6 52074 Aachen / DE | 08 /
Kühlewein, Matthias Panoramastrasse 29 72070 Tübingen / DE | 09 /
Belschner, Ralf Rigistrasse 10 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 10 /
Lohrmann, Peter Blumhardtstrasse 10/1 73054 Eislingen / DE | 11 /
Bogenberger, Florian Ingeborgstrasse 3a 81825 München / DE | 12 /
Wuerz, Thomas Mitterfeldring 2 85586 Poing / DE | 13 /
Millsap, Arnold 2383 Curtis Rd. Leonard, MI 48367 / US | 14 /
Heuts, Patrick De Garf 15 6581 SJ Malden / NL | 15 /
Hugel, Robert Joseph-von-Eichendorff-Strasse 9 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | 16 /
Führer, Thomas Pappelweg 6 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 17 /
Müller, Bernd Eugen-Hegele-Weg 19 71229 Leonberg / DE | 18 /
Hartwich, Florian Lerchenstrasse 17/1 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 19 /
Zinke, Manfred Altdorfer Strasse 29 52066 Aachen / DE | 20 /
Berwanger, Josef Parkweg 1 85586 Poing / DE | 21 /
Ebner, Christian Karl-Schmolz-Strasse 21 80997 München / DE | 22 /
Weiler, Harald Ziegelstrasse 23/2 73033 Göppingen / DE | 23 /
Fuhrmann, Peter Jean-Bremen-Strasse 10 52080 Aachen / DE | 24 /
Schedl, Anton Krumbacher Strasse 8 80798 München / DE | 25 /
Peller, Martin Bauerstrasse 31 80796 München / DE | [2005/31] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
Forest, Thomas M. 54503 Berryfield Macomb, MI 48042-2243 / US | ||
02 /
Hedenetz, Bernd Bismarckstrasse 40 73770 Denkendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Rausch, Mathias Wallbergstrasse 30 85570 Marktschwaben / DE | |||
04 /
Temple, Christopher Eigerstrasse 29 81825 München / DE | |||
05 /
Eisele, Harald Ulmenallee 12 25421 Pinneberg / DE | |||
06 /
Elend, Bernd Alsterdorfer Strasse 81 22299 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
Ungermann, Jörn Am Weisenberg 6 52074 Aachen / DE | |||
08 /
Kühlewein, Matthias Panoramastrasse 29 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
09 /
Belschner, Ralf Rigistrasse 10 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | |||
10 /
Lohrmann, Peter Blumhardstrasse 10/1 73054 Eislingen / DE | |||
11 /
Bogenberger, Florian Ingeborgstrasse 3a 81825 München / DE | |||
12 /
Wuerz, Thomas Mitterfeldring 2 85586 Poing / DE | |||
13 /
Millsap, Arnold 2383 Curtis Rd. Leonard, MI 48367 / US | |||
14 /
Heuts, Patrick De Garf 15 6581 SJ Malden / NL | |||
15 /
Hugel, Robert Joseph-von-Eichendorff-Strasse 9 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
16 /
Führer, Thomas Pappelweg 6 70839 Gerlingen / DE | |||
17 /
Müller, Bernd Eugen-Hegele-Weg 19 71229 Leonberg / DE | |||
18 /
Hartwich, Florian Lerchenstrasse 17/1 72762 Reutlingen / DE | |||
19 /
Zinke, Manfred Altdorfer Strasse 29 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
20 /
Berwanger, Josef Parkweg 1 85586 Poing / DE | |||
21 /
Ebner, Christian Karl-Schmolz-Strasse 21 80997 München / DE | |||
22 /
Weiler, Harald Ziegelstrasse 23/2 73033 Göppingen / DE | |||
23 /
Fuhrmann, Peter Jean-Bremen-Strasse 10 52080 Aachen / DE | |||
24 /
Schedl, Anton Krumbacher Strasse 8 80798 München / DE | |||
25 /
Peller, Martin Bauerstrasse 31 80796 München / DE | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008739.9 | 16.04.2003 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | EP20020008171 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02008171 | DE2002116984 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216984 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355459 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1355459 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355459 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64, H04J3/06, H04L7/08, H04L12/403, B60R16/02 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04L12/40026 (EP,US);
H03M13/43 (EP,US);
H04J3/0652 (EP,US);
H04L12/4035 (EP,US);
H04L12/417 (EP,US);
H04L12/44 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L7/0331 (EP,US);
H03M13/09 (EP,US);
H04J3/0682 (EP,US);
H04J3/0694 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40241 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6435 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | H04L12/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Synchronisieren von Uhren in einem verteilten Kommunikationssystem | [2003/43] | English: | Method for synchronizing clocks in a distributed communication system | [2003/43] | French: | Procédé pour synchroniser des horloges dans un système de communication distribué | [2005/31] |
Former [2003/43] | Procédé pour synchroniser des horologes dans un système de communication distribué | Examination procedure | 27.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | BE | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | CZ | 14.12.2005 | EE | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | FR | 14.12.2005 | IT | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | RO | 14.12.2005 | SI | 14.12.2005 | SK | 14.12.2005 | TR | 14.12.2005 | BG | 14.03.2006 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | ES | 25.03.2006 | LU | 16.04.2006 | IE | 17.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | HU | 15.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
FR | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
RO | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
LU | 16.04.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
RO | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
LU | 16.04.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
FR | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
RO | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
LU | 16.04.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
RO | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
RO | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
HU | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3726742 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 16,17 * claim 3 *; | [XY]US5907685 (DOUCEUR JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE19810293 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4,4 * page 2, line 31 - line 54 *; | [PX]US2003067873 (FUHRMANN PETER [DE], et al) [PX] 9* the whole document *; | [XY] - TEMPLE C, "Avoiding the babbling-idiot failure in a time-triggered communication system", FAULT-TOLERANT COMPUTING, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. TWENTY-EIGHTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MUNICH, GERMANY 23-25 JUNE 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980623), ISBN 0-8186-8470-4, pages 218 - 227, XP010291298 [X] 9,11,14,15 * page 220, paragraph 2.2 - page 222, paragraph 3.3 * [Y] 16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FTCS.1998.689473 | [A] - BERWANGER J ET AL, "FLEXRAY - THE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR ADVANCED AUTOMOTIVE CONTROL SYSTEMS", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, WARRENDALE, PA, US, (20010305), vol. 2001-1-676, ISSN 0148-7191, XP009023349 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - J. LUNDELIUS WELCH AND N LYNCH, "A New Fault-Tolerant Algorithm for Clock Synchronisation", INFORMATION AND COMPUTATION, (1988), vol. 77, pages 1 - 36, XP009026267 [A] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0890-5401(88)90043-0 |