Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6812442 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2004 | B2 | US2004079751 | 29.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20020065350 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100486588B | Global Dossier | 03.05.2005 | B1 | KR20040036370 | 30.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020065350 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004146341 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020065350 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1414277 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2005 | A3 | EP1414277 | 28.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20020065350 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1492190 | 28.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20020065350 | 24.10.2002 |