EP1350798 - Allergenic protein HEV b III of natural rubber latex, its production and use in assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF THE RUBBER RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF MALAYSIA 260, Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | For all designated states UNIVERSITI SAINS MALAYSIA 11800 Minden Penang / MY | [2007/04] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF THE RUBBER RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF MALAYSIA 260, Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITI SAINS MALAYSIA 11800 Minden Penang / MY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cardosa, Mary Jane, Universiti Sains Malaysia 11800 Minden Penang / MY | 02 /
Sharifah, Hamid, Universiti Sains Malaysia 11800 Minden Penang / MY | 03 /
Samuel-Verghese, Shirley, The Rubber Research Institute of Malaysia, 260 Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | 04 /
Sunderasan, Elumalai, The Rubber Research Institute of Malaysia, 260 Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | 05 /
Yeang, Hoong Yeet, The Rubber Research Institute of Malaysia, 260 Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | 06 /
Samsidar, Hamzah, The Rubber Research Institute of Malaysia, 260 Jalan Ampang 50450 Kuala Lumpur / MY | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03008978.3 | 15.09.1995 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | MY19940002468 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: MY 9402468 | MY19950001205 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: MY 9501205 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350798 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350798 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C07K16/16, A61K39/35, C07K1/14, G01N33/53 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
C08C3/02 (EP,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C07K16/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/41] | Title | German: | Allergieauslösendes Protein Hev b III aus natürlichem Gummi-Latex, seine Herstellung und Anwendung in Nachweismethoden | [2003/41] | English: | Allergenic protein HEV b III of natural rubber latex, its production and use in assays | [2003/41] | French: | Protéine allergénique hev b III du latex du caoutchouc naturel, sa production et sa utilisation dans les diagnostics | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95306534.9 / EP0704457 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9507298 (ANSELL INC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * pages 1-3; examples; claims *; | [A] - MORALES, C. ET AL., "Anaphylaxis produced by rubber glove contact ...", CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, vol. 19, pages 425 - 430, XP002242826 [A] 1-10 * p. 426, tab. 1; p. 429 * | [A] - BEEZHOLD, D.H. ET AL., "Identification of a 46-kD latex protein allergen in health care workers", CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., vol. 98, pages 408 - 413, XP002242827 [A] 1-10 * introduction; p. 409-411 * | [A] - TODT, J.C. & OWNBY, D.R., "Amino acid analysis of allergenic proteins from raw non-ammoniated latex", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., vol. 93, no. 1(2), page 288, XP002242828 [A] 1-10 * abstract 721 * | [A] - AKARAWA, A. ET AL., "Characterization of latex allergens", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., vol. 93, page 288, XP002242829 [A] 1-10 * abstract 723 * | [PX] - LU LIANG-JUN ET AL, "Characterization of a Major Latex Allergen Associated with Hypersensitivity in Spina Bifida Patients.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 155, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2721 - 2728, XP002242830 [PX] 1-10 * figures 1C,3 * | [PX] - ALENIUS H ET AL, "Purification and partial amino acid sequencing of a 27-kD natural rubber allergen recognized by latex-allergic children with spina bifida.", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY. SWITZERLAND MAR 1995, (199503), vol. 106, no. 3, ISSN 1018-2438, pages 258 - 262, XP009011559 [PX] 1-10 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000236851 | [PX] - CARDOSA, M.J. ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies identify different antigens in proteins eluted from natural rubber latex gloves obtained from different sources", JOURNAL OF NATURAL RUBBER RESEARCH (1994), 9(4), 270-7, (1994), XP009011574 [PX] 1-10 * figure 1 * |