EP1468661 - Disposable excreta device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cinelli, Fabio Via Fonte Borea, 101 65100 Pescara / IT | 02 /
Denti, Federica Via Tevere, 21 65016 Montesilvana / IT | 03 /
Costea, Karin Braeunigstrasse 10 67550 Worms / DE | 04 /
Colaianni, Antonello Via Jasoni, 16 65126 Pescara / IT | 05 /
James, Martin Contrada Macchiano, 45 65016 Montesilvana Colle / IT | 06 /
Huhn, Wolfgang Strada dell'Acquedotto, 10 66013 Chieti / IT | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 Sambuceto 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | ||
Former [2004/43] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128/130 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | Application number, filing date | 03008982.5 | 17.04.2003 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468661 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/82, A61F5/443 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP);
A61F13/82 (EP);
A61F5/443 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | Wegwerfvorrichtung für Ausscheidungen | [2004/43] | English: | Disposable excreta device | [2004/43] | French: | Collecteur d'excréments jetable | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3081771 (LEE CLARENCE I) [X] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 7 - line 10; figures 1-5; claim 3 *; | [X]US4347843 (DE ZAEPFFEL BRIGITTE C R) [X] 1-3,12 * column 1, line 4 - line 15 * * column 2, line 34 - line 48; figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9629968 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] * page 9, paragraph 3; figure 3 *; | [X]WO0000123 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * page 20, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 25, paragraph 2 - page 26, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO0072791 (CONFAB SERVICES AG [CH], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US6242665 (MALOWANIEC KRZYSZTOF D [DE]) [A] * column 3, line 27 - line 34 * |