EP1422148 - Transport package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duropack Wellpappe Ansbach GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephan, Thomas Pfarrstrasse 9 91595 Burgoberbach / DE | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Karrais, Martin HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Karrais, Martin Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009215.9 | 23.04.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | DE2002155034 | 19.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255034 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422148 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422148 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/44, B65D6/18, B65D77/04, F42B39/20 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B65D5/448 (EP);
B65D7/26 (EP);
B65D77/0413 (EP);
F42B39/14 (EP);
F42B39/20 (EP);
F42D5/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | Transportverpackung | [2004/22] | English: | Transport package | [2004/22] | French: | Emballage de transport | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 05.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | LU | 23.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE622597 (CHAROCOPOS) [A] 1,9 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 1; figure - *; | [A]GB191315181 (BADDELEY ROSE MARY [NZ]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB828626 (G K N REINFORCEMENTS LTD) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE19741339 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10,11,14,15 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 20; figure - * [A] 12,13; | [YA]US2002134054 (BARKER JAMES MARSHALL [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10,11,14,15 * page 1, column R, line 57 - page 2, column L, line 11 * * page 3, column L, line 18 - column R, line 23; figure - * [A] 12,13 |