EP1380472 - Electronic architecture of a means for transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dohmeyer, Volker Alte Talstrasse 9 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Peter Auf der Heide 6 71120 Grafenau / DE | 03 /
Keydel, Martin Hauptstrasse 8 73730 Esslingen-Zell / DE | 04 /
Klenk, Udo Burckhardtstrasse 65 70374 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Leboch, Stefan Kochgasse 1 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 06 /
Gislinde, Lukas Teichlenstrasse 1 72108 Rottenburg / DE | 07 /
Müller, Axel Urbanstrasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | 08 /
Müller, Thomas Silcherstrasse 20 74420 Oberrot / DE | 09 /
Peraus, Alexander Grünewaldstrasse 4 73066 Uhingen / DE | 10 /
Sakretz, Robert Jägerstrasse 6 71272 Renningen / DE | 11 /
Schmidt, Ulrich Gazellenstrasse 24 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 12 /
Schneider, Bernd Tannenweg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | 13 /
Wohlgemuth, Florian Gutbrodstr. 40 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/03] | Application number, filing date | 03009273.8 | 24.04.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | DE2002126697 | 15.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10226697 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380472 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B60R16/0315 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | B60R16/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronik-Architektur für ein Verkehrsmittel | [2004/03] | English: | Electronic architecture of a means for transport | [2004/03] | French: | Architecture électronique pour un moyen de transport | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19818114 (ZANDER GERD [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, lines 25-35 * * column 4, lines 15-31 * * column 5, lines 17-41,54-67 * * column 6, lines 26-45 * [A] 3-5,7; | [A]US6094416 (YING JEFFREY [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, lines 35-60 ** column 2, lines 4-45 * |