EP1356917 - Apparatus for shaping and/or sealing a package unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREIF-VELOX Maschinenfabrik GmbH Kronsforder Landstrasse 177 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Norbert Frankfurter Str.100 35773 Hennef / DE | 02 /
Dreier, Hans Bernd Lange Str.81 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009386.8 | 25.04.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | DE2002206561U | 25.04.2002 Original published format: DE 20206561 U | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1356917 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1356917 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356917 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B65B51/22, B65B51/26, // B29C65/74 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B65B51/225 (EP);
B29C65/08 (EP);
B29C65/7443 (EP);
B29C65/7451 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B29C66/43121 (EP);
B29C66/81419 (EP);
B29C66/81433 (EP);
B29C66/431 (EP);
B29C66/432 (EP);
B29C66/81417 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/19] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausbilden und/oder Verschliessen einer Verpackungseinheit | [2003/44] | English: | Apparatus for shaping and/or sealing a package unit | [2003/44] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication et/ou la fermeture d'un emballage | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 07.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11245305 ; | [Y]US4526565 (HUMMEL JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 11-14* figures 16,18,20 *; | [XY]EP1066951 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,3,7-22 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 4 * [Y] 11-14; | [X]US2002011048 (KOEHN UWE [DE]) [X] 11 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] *; | [XP]EP1232850 (GREIF VELOX MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1 * figures 1a,1b,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11245305 A 19990914 (LIHIT LAB INC) [X] 1 * figure 13 * * page 4, paragraph 19 * |