EP1374730 - Device for adjusting the height of a drawer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 I-22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 I-22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009547.5 | 28.04.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002209517U | 19.06.2002 Original published format: DE 20209517 U | DE2002211803U | 31.07.2002 Original published format: DE 20211803 U | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374730 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374730 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A47B88/427 (EP,US);
A47B88/40 (KR);
A47B88/407 (EP,US);
A47B2088/4276 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0054 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Höhenverstellung einer Schublade | [2004/01] | English: | Device for adjusting the height of a drawer | [2004/01] | French: | Dispositif de reglage de la hauteur d'un tiroir | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007177.8 / EP1550385 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.04.2006 | CZ | 05.04.2006 | EE | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | FR | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | RO | 05.04.2006 | SK | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | LU | 28.04.2006 | BE | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | BG | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | HU | 06.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
FR | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 28.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
BG | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
HU | 06.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 28.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
FR | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
BG | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
HU | 06.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 28.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
BG | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
HU | 06.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
BG | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
HU | 06.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
BG | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
EE | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
RO | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
SK | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0701787 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER MEPLA WERKE) [AD] 9,32* the whole document *; | [AD]DE8228143U (HAGENHENRICH GMBH & CO KG METALLWARENFABRIK) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE9300260U (PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO) [X] 9,37 * figure 5 * [Y] 32-34,36; | [AD]EP0545329 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE4301327 (FULTERER GMBH [AT]) [X] 9,25,27,37 * the whole document * [Y] 32-34,36; | [AD]DE9318383U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9320197U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4414462 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER MEPLA WERKE [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29600180U (KLAUS BRUMMERNHENRICH KUNSTSTO [DE]) [X] 9 * the whole document * |