EP1473657 - Method and device for the authentication of documents and goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING S.A. Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vasic, Milan Rue de l'Ancien-Port 8 1201 Geneva / CH | 02 /
Müller, Edgar Rue P.-A. de Faucigny 7 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 03009605.1 | 29.04.2003 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473657 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G07D7/12 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G06K7/10831 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/1094 (EP,KR,US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,KR,US);
G07D7/121 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifizierung von Dokumenten und Waren | [2004/45] | English: | Method and device for the authentication of documents and goods | [2004/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'authentification de documents et de marchandises | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.06.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5586212 (MCCONICA CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1,2,13,14 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 4 * * column 7, line 13 - line 25 * * column 7, line 43 - line 53 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5743633 (CHAU CHIU W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 46; figure 2 *; | [A]US6042012 (OLMSTEAD BRYAN L [US], et al) [A] 2,14* column 38, line 31 - line 34 *; | [A]US6172745 (VOSER CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 25 - line 42 * * column 5, line 32 - line 57 * * column 6, line 20 - line 65 *; | [A]US2002031266 (MCGREW STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 11 * column 3, line 6 - line 10 *; | [X]WO0231780 (BANK OF ENGLAND [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,12,13,15,19-21 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 6 * * page 29, line 23 - line 30 * * figure 15 * |