EP1473137 - Process for melting and homogenizing bimodal or multimodal polyolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coperion Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH & Co. KG Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkhardt, Ulrich Theobald-Kerner-Strasse 14 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009648.1 | 30.04.2003 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473137 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/50, B29C47/40, B29B7/48 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B29B7/728 (EP,US);
B29B7/483 (EP,US);
B29B7/487 (EP,US);
B29B7/60 (EP,US);
B29B7/826 (EP,US);
B29C48/37 (EP,US);
B29C48/387 (EP,US);
B29C48/395 (EP,US);
B29C48/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufschmelzen und Homogenisieren von multimodalen und bimodalen Polyolefinen | [2004/45] | English: | Process for melting and homogenizing bimodal or multimodal polyolefins | [2004/45] | French: | Procédé de fusion et homogénéisation de polyoléfines bimodales ou multimodales | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1416469 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]GB1167850 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 58 - page 2, line 64; figure - *; | [X]US3702691 (FRITSCH RUDOLF P) [X] 1-16 * column 5, line 34 - column 5, line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1033226 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * column 16, line 30 - column 16, line 33 *; | [X]WO03018288 (PONZIELLI GUISEPPE [IT]) [X] 1-16 * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 4 * * page 10, line 2 - page 10, line 20; figure 2 * |