EP1365166 - Torque transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körber, Martin Eugen-Roth-Strasse 4 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2003/48] | Application number, filing date | 03009666.3 | 30.04.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | DE2002123424 | 25.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10223424 | [2003/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365166 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365166 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06, F16D1/112, F16H57/02 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
F16D1/112 (EP);
F16D23/06 (EP);
F16D2023/0637 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/34] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drehmomentübertragungseinrichtung | [2003/48] | English: | Torque transmission device | [2003/48] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de couple | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2313593 (PITNER ALFRED [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 5, line 13 - line 23 * * figures 1-10 *; | [Y]DE4008906 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0572126 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0734936 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5666854 (BURI GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1-6b * | by applicant | DE3939274 |