EP1363056 - Normally closed electromagnetic valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirase, Takaomi, Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd. No.840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Naoki, Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd. No.840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009864.4 | 14.05.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | JP20020140259 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002140259 | JP20030103632 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003103632 | JP20030103633 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003103633 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1363056 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1363056 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363056 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, B60T8/36 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
F16K31/0665 (EP,US);
B60T8/363 (EP,US);
B60T8/3675 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/37] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Normal geschlossenes Elektromagnetventil | [2003/47] | English: | Normally closed electromagnetic valve | [2003/47] | French: | Soupape électromagnetique normalement fermée | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 05.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5542755 (STAIB HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,3* column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 * | Examination | DE19815599 |