EP1363047 - Shift device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho 260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Syamoto, Noriyasu K.K.Tokai Rika Denki Seisakus. 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2007/01] |
Former [2003/47] | 01 /
Syamoto, Noriyasu K. K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03009877.6 | 15.05.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | JP20020140007 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002140007 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1363047 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1363047 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363047 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/04, F16H59/02 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
F16H59/044 (EP,US);
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2003 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20067 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20159 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | F16H59/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltvorrichtung | [2003/47] | English: | Shift device | [2003/47] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesses | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4519266 (REINECKE ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]US5179867 (SAKAKIBARA SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2 * column 9, line 55 - column 11, line 8 ** figures 5,7,8,9a,9b,10a,10b * |