21.12.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
25.05.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
16.06.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.12.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.09.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2005 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.06.2005 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.06.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
09.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
24.09.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
05.02.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
12.07.2003 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|