Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7313332 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2007 | B2 | US2004223767 | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03010238 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1475906 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2006 | B1 | EP1475906 | 10.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03010238 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60306895T | 01.02.2007 | T2 | DE60306895D1 | 31.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP03010238 | 07.05.2003 |