EP1361137 - Safety steering and operating method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | [2009/47] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Olaf Wiesenstrasse 62 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Manfred Klaus Patentanwälte Walter . Eggers . Lindner Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Lindner, Manfred Klaus, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Walter-Eggers-Lindner Göllheimer Strasse 5 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010279.2 | 07.05.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | DE2002207190U | 07.05.2002 Original published format: DE 20207190 U | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1361137 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1361137 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361137 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/181, B62D1/19, B62D1/18 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B62D1/181 (EP,US);
B62D1/195 (EP,US);
B62D1/197 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | B62D1/181, B62D1/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/11] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitslenkung und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2003/46] | English: | Safety steering and operating method therefor | [2003/46] | French: | Direction de sécurité et méthode de mise en oeuvre | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4344681 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [A] 1,11-13* the whole document *; | [XA]DE19829238 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 6,8; | [DX]WO0076832 (KRUPP PRESTA AG [LI], et al) [DX] 1,3-5,9,15,16 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6264239 (LINK MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 9-11; | [DX]WO0164497 (KRUPP PRESTA AG [LI], et al) [DX] 1,3,5,9-11,14-16 * the whole document * |