EP1391439 - Methods and apparatus for coloring optical fibers during draw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FITEL USA CORPORATION (a Delaware Corporation) 2000 Northeast Expressway, Suite F020 Norcross Georgia 30071 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states FITEL USA CORPORATION (a Delaware Corporation) 2000 Northeast Expressway, Suite F020 Norcross, Georgia 30071 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xiong, Shunhe 311 Belmont Drive Alpharetta, Georgia 30022 / US | 02 /
Zhou, Zhi 269 Hardin Home Way Lawrenceville, Georgia 30043 / US | 03 /
Turnipseed, John Michael 1080 Saybrook Circle Lilburn, Georgia 30047 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010403.8 | 08.05.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | US20020226363 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: US 226363 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1391439 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1391439 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/10, G02B6/16, G02B6/44, G01B11/06 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
G02B6/4482 (EP,US);
C03C25/1065 (EP,US);
C03C25/475 (EP,US);
G02B6/02395 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | C03C25/10, G02B6/16, G02B6/44 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/31] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Färben von optischen Fasern während des Ziehens | [2004/09] | English: | Methods and apparatus for coloring optical fibers during draw | [2004/09] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la coloration des fibres optiques pendant le tirage | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0532291 (YORK TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [Y] 21-23 * column 1, line 4 - line 35 *; | [A]EP0565798 (BORDEN INC [US]) [A] 1,4* page 10, line 3 - line 7 *; | [DX]WO0109053 (DSM NV [NL]) [DX] 1-20 * page 41, line 11 - page 50, line 8 * * page 3, line 22 - line 28 * * page 5, line 1 - line 9 *; | [XY]EP1209132 (DSM NV [NL]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0079] , [0101] , [0137] , [0138] * * Idem * [Y] 21-23 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP9080275 A 19970328 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * |