EP1365020 - Crystal structure and mutants of interleukin-1beta converting enzyme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4242 / US | [2005/03] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 40 Allston Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Keith P. 298 Beacon Street, apt.1 Boston, MA 02166 / US | 02 /
Griffith, James P. 15 Wood Ridge Circle Weston, MA 02193 / US | 03 /
Kim, Eunice E. 1500 Worcester Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
Livingston, David J. 20 Madison Avenue Newtonville, MA 02160 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
Wilson, Keith P. 6 Longwood Drive Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | ||
02 /
Griffith, James P. 15 Wood Ridge Circle Weston, MA 02193 / US | |||
03 /
Kim, Eunice E. 1500 Worcester Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
04 /
Livingston, David J. 20 Madison Avenue Newtonville, MA 02160 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03010692.6 | 16.06.1995 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | US19940261582 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: US 261582 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365020 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12Q1/37 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/6475 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/48] | Title | German: | Kristallstruktur und Mutanten des Interleukin-1-beta konvertierenden Enzyms | [2003/48] | English: | Crystal structure and mutants of interleukin-1beta converting enzyme | [2003/48] | French: | Structure cristalline et mutants de l'enzyme de conversion de l'interleukine-1-beta | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95922329.8 / EP0765388 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950922329) is 10.12.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9400154 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [Y] 10-33; | [XY] - J. THOMSON ET AL, "In vito folding and autoprocessing of active interleukin-1 beta converting enzyme from an inactive recombinant precursor", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, SUPPLEMENT, (19940305), vol. 18D, page 148, XP008022057 [X] 1-9 * see abstract S 229 * [Y] 10-33 | [DX] - N. THORNBERRY ET AL, "A novel heterodimeric cysteine protease is required for interleukin-1-beta processing in monocytes", NATURE, (19920430), vol. 356, pages 768 - 774, XP001160810 [DX] 22-25,28 * page 771, column R, line 2 - page 773 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/356768a0 | [AY] - P. BRYAN, "Protein engineering", BIOTECH. ADV, vol. 5, pages 221 - 234, XP002093071 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * especially page 222, last two sentences * [Y] 10-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0734-9750(87)90319-3 | [AY] - KAJIHARA A, "PROTEIN MODELLING USING A CHIMERA REFERENCE PROTEIN DERIVED FROM EXONS", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (19930801), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 615 - 620, XP000385582 [A] 1-9 * see introduction * [Y] 12-33 | [AY] - A. RUSSELL, "Rational modification of enzyme catalysis by engineering surface charge", NATURE, (19870806), vol. 328, pages 496 - 500, XP000887130 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * [Y] 12-33 | [A] - C. SCHUBERT WRIGHT ET AL, "Structure of Subtilisin BPN' at 2.5A resolution", NATURE, vol. 221, pages 235 - 242, XP001160811 [A] 10-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/221235a0 | [A] - D. MUSIL ET AL, "The refined 2.15A X-ray crystal structure of human liver cathepsin B: the structural basis for its specificity", THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 10, no. 9, pages 2321 - 2330, XP000749834 [A] 12-33 * the whole document * | [A] - A. SIELECKI ET AL, "Structure of recombinant human renin, a target for cardiovascular-active drugs, at 2.5A resolution", SCIENCE, vol. 243, pages 1346 - 1351, XP001160820 [A] 12-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2493678 | [PX] - WILSON, KEITH P. ET AL, "Structure and mechanism of interleukin -1.beta. converting enzyme", NATURE (LONDON) (1994), 370(6487), 270-5 CODEN: NATUAS;ISSN: 0028-0836, XP002054972 [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/370270a0 | [PX] - WALKER, N. P. C. ET AL, "Crystal structure of the cysteine protease interleukin -1.beta.- converting enzyme: a (p20/p10)2 homodimer", CELL (CAMBRIDGE, MASS.) (1994), 78(2), 343-52 CODEN: CELLB5;ISSN: 0092-8674, XP002050334 [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(94)90303-4 |