EP1394660 - Switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumberg Connect GmbH Im Gewerbepark 2 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2007/20] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Lumberg Connect GmbH & Co. KG Im Gewerbepark 2 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Michael Harrenscheid 7c 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte, Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011273.4 | 17.05.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | DE20021039157 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10239157 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1394660 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1394660 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1622 (EP,US);
G06F1/1679 (EP,US);
G06F1/1681 (EP,US);
G06F1/1683 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
H01H19/62 (EP,US);
H01R35/04 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
E05D11/0081 (EP,US);
E05Y2999/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DK, FI, IT, SE [2007/05] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltvorrichtung | [2004/10] | English: | Switching device | [2004/10] | French: | Dispositif de commutation | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/31] | 04.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1590137 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 ** page 3 *; | [A]DE19503903 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 4 * * column 5, line 47 - line 52 *; | [X]US6373006 (TOKI NOZOMI [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 4 * * abstract * * figures 1A,1B,2 * |