EP1369628 - Pressure relief device with a rupture disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brilex Gesellschaft für Explosionsschutz mbH Hinterm Gallberg 15-17 59929 Brilon / DE | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunse, Martin Aamühlen 4 59929 Brilon / DE | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011396.3 | 20.05.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | DE20022008576U | 03.06.2002 Original published format: DE 20208576 U | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369628 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369628 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369628 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/16, A62C4/02 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
F16J13/24 (EP);
A62C4/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | F16K17/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | Druckentlastungsvorrichtung mit Berstscheibe | [2003/50] | English: | Pressure relief device with a rupture disc | [2003/50] | French: | Dispositif de dépressurisation avec un disque de rupture | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.09.2005 | EE | 07.09.2005 | FI | 07.09.2005 | RO | 07.09.2005 | SI | 07.09.2005 | SK | 07.09.2005 | TR | 07.09.2005 | BG | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | HU | 08.03.2006 | LU | 20.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | EE | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
RO | 07.09.2005 | ||
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
HU | 08.03.2006 | ||
LU | 20.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
RO | 07.09.2005 | ||
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
HU | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
RO | 07.09.2005 | ||
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
HU | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
HU | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
SK | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SI | 07.09.2005 | ||
BG | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2801768 (IMMEL RALPH B) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 48 - line 52 *; | [X]US3394843 (GRADY JR CHARLES B, et al) [X] 1,3-5,11 * pages 1-4 * * column 3, line 13 - line 16 * * column 3, line 53 - line 59 *; | [A]US4013190 (WIGGINS EDWIN W, et al) [A] 1-14* column 7, line 47 - line 51 *; | [A]US4328901 (GUNDERMAN ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 16 *; | [A]US4484690 (NASH JAMES H [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 2 *; | [A]EP0256239 (EKSPLO KONTROL PATLAMAYI ONLEY [TR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [DA]DE3822012 (REMBE GMBH MESS UND REGELTECHN [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5191990 (FRITTS DONALD K [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1044703 (HOERBIGER VENTILWERKE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | CH520534 | DE3822012 |