Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4271512B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2009 | B2 | JP2004046858 | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US18681202 | 28.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1376384 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2007 | A3 | EP1376384 | 02.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18681202 | 28.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2431518 | 22.03.2011 | C | CA2431518 | 28.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18681202 | 28.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7188309 | 06.03.2007 | B2 | US2004003350 | 01.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18681202 | 28.06.2002 |