Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
01.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
09.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
17.03.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
08.02.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
22.10.2005 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.07.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.07.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
10.06.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.04.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
22.04.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
14.12.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.10.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
15.10.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |