EP1481761 - Finishing machine for crankshafts and camshafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thielenhaus Technologies GmbH Schwesterstrasse 50 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinwender, Horst Chamissostrasse 71 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011786.5 | 24.05.2003 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481761 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481761 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B5/42, B24B35/00, B24B21/02 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B24B21/02 (EP);
B24B35/00 (EP);
B24B5/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/34] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Finishbearbeitung von Wellen, insbesondere von Kurbel- und Nockenwellen | [2004/49] | English: | Finishing machine for crankshafts and camshafts | [2004/49] | French: | Machine de finition pour vilebrequins et arbres à cames | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.05.2006 | GB | 03.05.2006 | IT | 03.05.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | GB | 03.05.2006 | |
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
FR | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | GB | 03.05.2006 | |
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | GB | 03.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE10009980 (THIELENHAUS ERNST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract * |