Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
21.09.2005 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.09.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.07.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
05.07.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.07.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.07.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.10.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |