Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
30.06.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2006 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
31.05.2006 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | |
16.02.2006 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
02.02.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.10.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.06.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.11.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
02.11.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
10.07.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
26.03.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
17.10.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |